+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 897
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/15/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/15/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/8/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/1/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2016: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
March 1, 2016: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor