+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 04/14/2016
- Pub. Ch. 807
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 74, Nays 11, PNV 2
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0798)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0705)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/28/2016
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/9/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 30, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
March 28, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 9
March 9, 2016: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9