+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0746)
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/26/2018
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 26, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 7, 2018: SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
March 7, 2018: TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor