+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 837
- Effective date(s) 04/28/2014; 07/01/2014
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor returned.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0911)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1092)
- Am. no. 3 tabled, Ayes 66, Nays 24
- Passed H., Ayes 84, Nays 8
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0940)
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/2/2014
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0940
Amendment 1-0 to SB2088
+ − Votes (4)
April 9, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY Stewart PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 25
April 9, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 9
April 2, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 31
March 24, 2014: S. C&L COMM.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor