+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 04/08/2022
- Pub. Ch. 778
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0602)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0539)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/7/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/2/2022
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/2/2022
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/23/2022
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 2/23/2022
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/16/2022
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 24, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
March 7, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 2, 2022: TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor