+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 908
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA1183)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1142)
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/17/2014
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/17/2014
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/16/2014
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2014
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2014
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ref. to S. F,W&M w/recommend, as amended
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/31/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/25/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal.
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/18/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to 3/18/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/11/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to 3/11/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/4/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 9, 2014: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor