+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 35
- Effective date(s) 03/22/2019
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 1
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0026)
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019
- Senate Reset on calendar 2-25-19
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/21/2019
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/12/2019
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
February 25, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
February 12, 2019: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor