+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 681
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2020
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 79, Nays 15, PNV 1
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 23, Nays 4, PNV 2
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/24/2020
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/18/2020
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
June 2, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2020: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor