+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 888
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2016
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2016
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/13/2016
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/13/2016
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/12/2016
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2016
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (2)
April 18, 2016: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
March 29, 2016: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor