+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2016
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2016
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor