+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 301
- Effective date(s) 05/08/2019
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 78, Nays 15, PNV 2
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0435)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0429)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0254)
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/26/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
April 22, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
April 15, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
April 9, 2019: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor