+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 326
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0387)
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/18/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 4/3/2013
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/3/2013
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 4/1/2013
- Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/3/2013
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013
- R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. Ed. Comm. 3/27/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 3, 2013: S. ED. COMM.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor