+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 939
- Effective date(s) 05/15/2018
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA1130)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/19/2018
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1130)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0869)
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2018
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2018
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2018
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/27/2018
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 19, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1
- Yeas: 7
April 17, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
April 4, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
March 20, 2018: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
March 20, 2018: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor