+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/18/2014
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/5/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/4/2014
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/4/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/11/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor