+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/16/2014
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. Reset on Last Regular Calendar of 2014
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/7/2014
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/7/2014
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/24/2014
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. Reset on Cal. for 3/24/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/20/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0815
Amendment 1-0 to SB2047
+ − Vote
March 12, 2014: S. ED. COMM.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (82)
Type:
Primary Sponsor