+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 701
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2014
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0962)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0766)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0783)
- Failed to adopt, Ayes 8, Nays 13, PNV 9 (Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0892)
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/24/2014
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. Reset on Cal. for 3/24/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/20/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/11/2014
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/5/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/4/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 27, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
March 24, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: Rule 39(3) MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY Kyle
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 9
March 24, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 32
March 11, 2014: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (61)
Type:
Primary Sponsor