+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 844
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
On May 1, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 18, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 26, Nays 2 (Amendment 1 - HA1010)
On April 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/15/2024
On April 11, 2024 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1010)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 75, Nays 8, PNV 3
On March 14, 2024 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0591)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 5, PNV 2
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/11/2024
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 3/11/2024
On March 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/7/2024
On February 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 1 PNV 2
On February 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2024
On January 31, 2024 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 29, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 15, 2024: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 11, 2024: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 85
- Present/NV: 1
April 11, 2024: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 1 BY PARKINSON PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 85
- Present/NV: 1
April 11, 2024: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 1 BY PARKINSON PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 85
- Present/NV: 1
April 11, 2024: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 85
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2024: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 27, 2024: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 1 PNV 2
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor