+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 131
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/18/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/13/2019
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 8
March 13, 2019: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor