+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/11/2020
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 11, 2020: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor