+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/16/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Trans & Safety Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Trans & Safety Comm.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 5, 2014: S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1