+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 766
- Effective date(s) 04/19/2016
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1004)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0669)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/14/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to 3/9/2016
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/2/2016
- Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to 3/2/2106
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/24/2016
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 2/24/2016
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/10/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
March 14, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 7
March 9, 2016: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor