+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/11/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/25/2014
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 2/25/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/18/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 2/18/2014
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/4/2014
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor