+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2016
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/13/2016
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/13/2016
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/12/2016
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee with recommendation, as amended
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/23/2016
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-refer to Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/16/2016
- Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 2/23/2016
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/neutral recommend
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/24/2015
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/24/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/17/2015
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee
On January 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On November 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor