+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pr. Ch. 31
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 3/16/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
March 16, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor