+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 857
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA1136)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0939)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0896)
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/14/2014
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/10/2014
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/24/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/20/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/20/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/18/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2014: S. FW&M COMM.
March 24, 2014: S. C&L COMM.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor