+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 669
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/9/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/2/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 2, 2016: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor