+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/15/2022
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/15/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/8/2022
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/1/2022
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor