+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 26, 2014: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 8