+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 743
- Effective date(s) 04/21/2014
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor returned.
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0848)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0814)
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 28, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/3/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 3/25/2014
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014
- R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. F,W&M Comm. 3/18/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0814
Amendment 1-0 to SB1966
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
April 3, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 3
March 25, 2014: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 11
March 12, 2014: S. ED. COMM.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor