+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1085
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/20/2016
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/20/2016
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on next to last calendar of 2016
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/7/2016
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 3/7/2016
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/29/2016
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 2/29/2016
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/22/2016
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 2/22/2016
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/17/2016
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/9/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
February 9, 2016: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor