+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 674
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/31/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Trans & Safety Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014
- Action Def. in S. Trans & Safety Comm. to 3/19/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Trans & Safety Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Trans & Safety Comm.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 19, 2014: S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor