+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2016
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/29/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/29/2016
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/22/2016
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/15/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/15/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/8/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor