+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 704
- Effective date(s) 06/01/2016
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 5, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/7/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/1/2016
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/recommend
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/9/2016
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 24, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 5
March 7, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 11
March 1, 2016: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor