+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 965
- Effective date(s) 04/27/2016
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 64, Nays 17, PNV 8
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 4
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/7/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/1/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
April 19, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 8
March 7, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 9
March 1, 2016: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor