+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 733
- Effective date(s) 04/18/2018
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 82, Nays 2, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0859)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0837)
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/28/2018
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/14/2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/7/2018
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/28/2018
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Transportation & Safety Committee to 2/21/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/14/2018
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 4, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 2
March 28, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 14, 2018: SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
March 14, 2018: TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9