+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor