+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 830
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2014
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor returned.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/8/2014
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/2/2014
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/2/2014
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/1/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/25/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/18/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/11/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/4/2014
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
April 10, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 87
April 8, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
April 2, 2014: S. JUD COMM.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor