+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/22/2016
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/22/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/15/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/15/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/8/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/8/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/1/2016
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/1/2016
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/23/2016
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/23/2016
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/16/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor