+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/15/2014
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/10/2014
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2014
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2014
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm.
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/26/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014
- Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/24/2014
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 26, 2014: S. ED. COMM.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor