+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
- Re-refer to S. Cal. Comm.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/15/2018
- Senate Reset on calendar 3/15/18
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/12/2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2018
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/20/2018
- Refer to Commerce & Labor Committee without recommendation
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/14/2018
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 28, 2018: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1
February 20, 2018: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
February 14, 2018: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor