+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 968
- Effective date(s) 05/19/2014
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 3
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1117)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1130)
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/14/2014
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/10/2014
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm.
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/26/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014
- Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/24/2014
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA1130
Amendment 1-0 to SB1924
+ − Votes (5)
April 16, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 3
April 16, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 48
April 14, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 31
April 8, 2014: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 10
March 26, 2014: S. ED. COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor