+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 730
- Effective date(s) 04/18/2018; 07/01/2018
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
- Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 1 (Amendment 1 - HA0912)
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/4/2018
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0912)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1029)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0825)
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/28/2018
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/15/2018
- Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/15/2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/8/2018
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 4, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1
- Yeas: 9
March 29, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 87
March 28, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 15, 2018: SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
March 15, 2018: SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor