+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 877
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2014
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 3, PNV 1
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1216)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0897)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0761)
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1023)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/3/2014
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/2/2014
- R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. on 4/2/14
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/2/2014
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/10/2014
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 14, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
April 3, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 31
April 2, 2014: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 10
March 10, 2014: S. H&W COMM.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor