+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
- Pub. Ch. 458
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 4
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/1/2021
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/23/2021
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On December 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
May 3, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
March 1, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 23, 2021: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor