+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 781
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0854)
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/9/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/19/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0854
Amendment 1-0 to SB1881
+ − Vote
March 19, 2014: S. ED. COMM.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor