+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 687
- Effective date(s) 06/01/2020
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On June 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/24/2020
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/19/2020
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 1
February 19, 2020: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor