+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 475
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/2/2019
- Senate Reset on calendar for 5/2/2019
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/1/2019
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/24/19
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/17/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/17/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate Education Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
April 17, 2019: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor