+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 792
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/3/2014
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/26/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014
- Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/24/2014
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 26, 2014: S. ED. COMM.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1