+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/25/2014
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.