+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 963
- Effective date(s) 05/19/2014; 01/01/2015
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1100)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1030)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/8/2014
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/1/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA1030
Amendment 1-0 to SB1860
+ − Votes (3)
April 15, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
April 8, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 31
April 1, 2014: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 8